Governing document YWCA OF GREAT BRITAIN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/10/1987 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/1992 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2015 as amended on 01 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELEGION AMONG WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF EITHER SEX,TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION,TO RELIEVE THEIR POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.