Governing document THE BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 21ST OCTOBER 1965, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1985, 17TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AND 25TH AUGUST 1994 as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND THE SPREAD OF EDUCATION AND PARTICULARLY TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO THE SCIENCE, ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY OF ASTRONAUTICS AND TO SUPPORT AND ENGAGE IN RESEARCH STUDIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.