Trustees THE HOWARD LEAGUE FOR PENAL REFORM (INCORPORATING THE HOWARD CENTRE FOR PENOLOGY)
Charity number: 251926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Fergus McNeill | Chair | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tomas William Thurogood-Hyde | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Bland | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Marks | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN TRESS | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zubaida Haque | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ben Bradford | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.