Accounts and annual returns WESTLEIGH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE CENTRE
Charity number: 251949
Charity reporting is overdue by 1544 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 83 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 83 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 448 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 448 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 813 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 813 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1178 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1178 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1544 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1544 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window