Trustees ESTA STRING TEACHERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 266193
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clifton Harrison | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip John Heyman | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Myrna Woods | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Sullivan | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Green | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Wilson | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kadiatu Kanneh | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Bruce | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Drury | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Elliott | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Wilson | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.