Trustees EAST WORLINGTON PARISH HALL
Charity number: 267969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK SHIPLEY | Chair | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jon Houghton | Trustee | 13 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Rhodes | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Pankhurst | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Good | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sedgwick | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Difford | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA LUNN | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Harford | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Guppy | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WALTON EDWARDS | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SANDY HAUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH LAURA BRIDGET HURST-BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.