Trustees THE ROYAL TANK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 269230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Gavin James Thompson | Chair | 21 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Mark Tompsett | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
MARK LUSON | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Patrick Carroll | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN LARCOMBE | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jason Michael Williams | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Brigadier Nicholas James Cowey | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.