Governing document ROYAL COLLEGE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS
Charity number: 275119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JAN 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JAN 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 APR 2017 as amended on 21 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE SCIENCE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY AND THE BETTER TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF PRACTITIONERS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.