Trustees ROYAL COLLEGE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS
Charity number: 275119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Lothian | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Atwal | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Odeth Richardson | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dunning | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Flower | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kalimah Ibrahiim | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kee Hean Lim | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Elizabeth Holding | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.