Trustees ST MARY'S CHURCH (HITCHIN) PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 276501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Free | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Glenys Bathmaker | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Russell Drinkwater Read | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Christopher E Bunce | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Elizabeth Marguerite Senechal MA | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
STEPHEN VINCENT PIKE | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||||
KEITH RICHARD HOSKINS | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
colin eades | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
FELICITY WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.