Trustees 2ND ST IVES (HUNTS) SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 279852
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon David Flanagan | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Margot | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sulivan | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Vencenza Jones | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire-Joanne Stewart | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Moore | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Leasure | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Susan Taylor | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROB TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY FERRIES | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW HLADKIWSKYJ | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.