Trustees SAINT CATHERINE'S HOSPICE TRUST
Charity number: 284701
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET MIDDLEBROOK | Chair | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Mudd | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Holbrook | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dougy Moederle-Lumb | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Westmoreland | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carole Standard-Sheader | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Cyril Stevenson | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM CHELL | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.