Governing document THE BRITISH CARDIAC PATIENTS ASSOCIATION ZIPPER CLUB
Charity number: 289190
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED 27TH MARCH 1986 AND 26TH MARCH 1987 AND 22ND APRIL 1989 AND AS AMENDED ON 20 APRIL 1996 AND 11TH MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND SUSTAIN CARDIAC PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND OTHERS; AND GENERALLY TO CONTRIBUTE TO CHARITABLE WORK IN HOSPITALS AND CARDIAC UNITS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PAPWORTH HOSPITAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.