Trustees 17TH PURLEY ST JOHN'S OLD COULSDON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 293899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GARLICK | Chair | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Beth Bickerstaffe | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Kindred | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Kindred | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Swift | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Bulbeck | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bickerstaffe | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Farooki | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Low | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Karen Lockyer | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Lockyer | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Docwra | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Peter Kingett | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Locke | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Paul Carlton Roberts | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mary Waters | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Rothwell Edwards | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.