Trustees THE DAIWA ANGLO-JAPANESE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 299955
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Tim Hitchens | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||
John Murray Charlton-Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keiichi Hayashi | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Mark Jeremy Walport | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Margaret Salter | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Sarah Tuke | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Takashi Hibino | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Angelica Turnbull | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ms Yoko Dochi | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Professor SACHIKO KUSUKAWA | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephen Barber | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Professor Hirotaka Takeuchi | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Yusuke Kawamura | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.