Trustees FAMILY LINKS (EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES)
Charity number: 1062514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hilary Frances Emery CBE | Chair | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Pease | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Masood Hassan | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Douglas Beach | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Margaret Judge | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Wendy Elizabeth Rose OBE | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA IRIS EMMETT | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND JEANNETTE PORTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.