Trustees INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Charity number: 1079573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NADINE CAMPBELL | Chair | 06 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Harpreet Kaur Kondel | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Esther Ngozi Sherato | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Gary Kernahan | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kerys Sheppard | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Matthew Parkes | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rebecca Mansell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Kelvin Robert Hopkins | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Joyce Fraser OBE | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Sofia Zeenat Sheikh | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
ROHAN HEWAVISENTI | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.