Trustees CLAYESMORE SCHOOL
Charity number: 306214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN IGNATIUS ANDREWS LLB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JULIA RACHEL BROWN | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dayle Martin Leslie Kirby | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Waller | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paul Sussman | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SHAW | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH HOWARD | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|||||
SALLY MARGARET WILSON | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIM INGRAM | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES CLAIR DEEMING | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HAYWOOD | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROSIE STIVEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.