Trustees ALL SAINTS MILLENNIUM TRUST (DARLINGTON) LIMITED
Charity number: 1061725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE SALLY JOHNSON | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne English | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN SHEPHERD | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Jennifer Sara Croft | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Alison Agnes Mannion | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr ALFRED COLIN PRICE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP ELLIOTT-LYALL | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Elliott | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH WASTNEDGE | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY DAVISON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISON MORAG BARKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.