Trustees HEATHFIELD SCHOOL
Charity number: 309086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elisabeth Collister | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Popplewell | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle More O'Ferrall | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Clare Cullen | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jeanette Lynch | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen Melcher | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Faber | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hon Frances Caroline Stanley | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|||||
SALLY VIRGINIA TULK HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WILLIAM GUY EGERTON-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BENEDICT GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.