Trustees THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY RIBBLE VALLEY BRANCH
Charity number: 1061492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Lloyd | Chair | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Youlton | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Youlton | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Holmes | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Walsh | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Holmes | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stoney | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stoney | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUDY GRIMSEY | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL BURROWS | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
MR CHRIS WADDINGTON | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RICHARD BROWN | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.