Trustees BUTE HOUSE PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS LIMITED
Charity number: 312739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthias Hauger | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vernee Samuel | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dianna Pierce-Burgess | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandrine Nathalie Paillasse | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GERARD WATNEY | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BROUGH | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA BARRON | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Sherman | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Beckitt | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Polly Mary Ruth McAndrew | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Perry | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.