Trustees HAKLUYT SOCIETY
Charity number: 313168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GLORIA CHRISTINE CLIFTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Lubaaba Al-Azami | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Joan Pau Rubies | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Parker | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Ladan Niayesh | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Marsh | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Stevenson | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natalya Din-Kariuki | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Elaine Murphy | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Matthew Day | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edwards | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bertie Mandelblatt | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Bank | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Nandini Das | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Derek Elliott | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janet Hartley | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maurice Michael Raraty | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Daniel Carey | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guido van Meersbergen | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eva Johanna Holmberg | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Knight | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jowitt Professor | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Bridges | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Felipe Fernandez-Armesto | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE HUNTER | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR MARGARET MAKEPEACE | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JOHN HOWGEGO | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOYCE LORIMER | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BARRITT | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR SARAH JACQUELINE TYACKE CB | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.