Trustees THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST
Charity number: 326446
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Keevil | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Duxbury | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Lambert | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gibbs | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jacqueline Wolfe-Murray | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christoper Peter Hotten | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Russell | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.