Trustees TOFS
Charity number: 327735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN CARL JACKSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Andrew Ian Bailey | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Marie Tyler | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Johns | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamasine Swan | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trace Helen Loffman | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Darrell Hill | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Graham Slater | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUE LEWIS-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.