Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND -
Charity number: 1053793-37
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION, SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE, THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE COMMUNITY SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 27 November 1996: Standard registration
- 30 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS COMMUNITY NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH GENERAL (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.