Trustees THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (SOMERSET BRANCH)
Charity number: 1061910
Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Forsyth | Chair | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WILSON | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DOBSON | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joan Cornwell | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Roles | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JONES | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM LYNES | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL GARRETT | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.