Accounts and annual returns NEW DIRECTIONS (BLACKPOOL) COMMUNITY SUPPORT
Charity number: 1063394
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 29 October 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 January 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 January 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 May 2009 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 May 2009 | 101 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window