Trustees THE RUNNYMEDE TRUST
Charity number: 1063609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE WILLIAM JONES CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lai-Har Cheung | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Iyiola Solanke | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maya Goodfellow | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Farah Elahi | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hossein Zahir | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Arday | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Hepburn Harrison-Graham | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.