Trustees TRINITY COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1137604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Sally Claire Davies | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor David Tong | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Crawford | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Toner | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Catherine Barnard | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Edward John Hinch | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cameron Andrew Petrie | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Louise Merrett | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicholas Jeremy Thomas | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin James Spagnolo | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caterina Ducati | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Reginald Turnill | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Samita Sen | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.