Trustees TAVISTOCK RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
Charity number: 1073407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS PRU MILLS | Chair | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joy Susan Hands | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Patricia Ann Girling | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CORINA WINEFRIDE CLEMENT | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA MARGARET LILLA TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET TILSTON | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH DILL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ROSAMOND MACKINTOSH | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.