Trustees SCENE AND HEARD
Charity number: 1077836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH DAVID ACKERMAN | Chair | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick John O'Shea | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Obiezekpazu | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Giselle Plosker | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|||||
John Morris Eric Rolph | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Bell | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEVIN | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Porter | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Millard | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.