Accounts and annual returns THE ACADEMY OF ENTERPRISE
Charity number: 1087850
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 02 April 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 02 April 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 10 June 2008 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 10 June 2008 | 41 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 27 April 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 11 May 2007 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 15 June 2006 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 20 June 2006 | 51 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window