Trustees ALTERNATIVES TO VIOLENCE PROJECT, BRITAIN
Charity number: 1085709
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Dzhuras-Dotta | Chair | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr KIM MARIA BEVAN | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dellapina | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
ARTHUR GERALD CHARLTON | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IAN TASSELL | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TARRILL BAKER | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Anne Walsh | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.