Governing document DAME VERA LYNN CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Charity number: 1089657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 2001, 8 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 1 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/06/2015 as amended on 22 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER RELEVANT RELATED SERVICES TO CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.