Trustees LEEDS ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT NETWORK
Charity number: 1092647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Wilson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Ekblom | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Maw | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Olga Fiorenza Radelaar | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Murdoch-Eaton | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Garforth | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicolle Levine | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mahmoud el Saboni | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Noel Nowosielski | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Long | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.