Trustees THE PLYMOUTH U3A
Charity number: 1094085
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Robinson | Chair | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dallas | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edwin Martin | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Thompson | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Hamm | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Cox | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacki Berry | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Crick | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parle | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ms Ann Cox | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ms Alyson Smith | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mr Brian Mathieson | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hodge | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.