Governing document SRI LANKA ISLAMIC (UK) ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 26 MARCH 2006 as amended on 26 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2021 as amended on 27 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AMONG MUSLIMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PRAYER GATHERING B) TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST MUSLIM STUDENTS D) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OF SUFFERING COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE BY FACILITATING HUMANITARIAN ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORTING WELFARE PROJECTS FOR THE SOCIAL UPLIFTMENT OF POOR COMMUNITIES IN SRI LANKA.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.