Trustees SHERWOOD ARCHERS
Charity number: 1097456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Woods | Chair | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Millard | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lamb | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sykes | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Davis | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Fuller | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pauline Burton | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tomalin | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Smith | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIO VITTORIO STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
||||||
Susan Ann STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANN STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.