BOURNE VALLEY GOOD NEIGHBOUR LINK SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity consists of a team of local volunteers who offer help with transport and care for people in need. This may be transport for an appointment or shopping, help at home or just a friendly chat. The charity is managed by a team of local volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 February 2005: Standard registration
- BVGNLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Tracey Welch | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dennis Andrews | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Elizabeth Louise Winborn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS R MILES | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BUCKLE | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.19k | £10.91k | £5.48k | £9.55k | £9.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £11.92k | £7.58k | £10.64k | £10.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED 8 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY, NEEDY OR DISABLED PERSONS IN THE BOURNE VALLEY PARISHES OF CHOLDERTON, ALLINGTON, IDMISTON AND THE WINTERBOURNES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOURNE VALLEY PARISHES OF CHOLDERTON, ALLINGTON, IDMISTON, THE WINTERBOURNES AND NEWTON TONY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Twingley
The Portway
Winterbourne Gunner
Salisbury
Wiltshire
SP4 6JL
- Phone:
- 01980611311
- Email:
- maureenatkinson16@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window