Trustees BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION
Charity number: 1110745
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Russell | Chair | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Simon Neil Nathaniel Foster | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
The Rt Revd Martin Charles William Gorick | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev JOSEPH BASAPPA SURAY | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
James Edward Wooldridge Green | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
REVEREND JOHN NICHOLAS LEEMING LATHAM | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev RACHEL ELIZABETH PARKINSON MA | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
MR DAVID OWEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
REV ADRIAN STUART ARGILE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
CAROLINE CROLLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
VERA MAY BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
STEVEN L BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
RT REVD CLIVE MALCOLM GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.