Trustees INTEGRAL ALLIANCE
Charity number: 1112515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Bremer-Bennett | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Goodwin | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Sundqvist | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Winnie Fung | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Maisiri | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guido Johannes De Vries | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Christine Reitsema | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alejandro Alba | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Copeland | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Melissa Anne Lipsett | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Myal Greene | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Betina Gollander-Jensen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stahl | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Archer | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adele Paterson | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lukkien | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harris | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|||||
IAN MCINNES | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FONTAINE MAURY | Trustee | 13 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN BUSSARD | Trustee | 13 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK GUIBORAT | Trustee | 07 April 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.