Trustees HOME-START NORTH-WEST HAMPSHIRE
Charity number: 1112233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANETTE MARGARET HEWITT | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Amanda Elizabeth Mary Britton | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Bailey | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Baker | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Naila Naheed Aslam | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Rebecca English | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Louise Fox | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Flower | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||
JEFFREY NORTHAM | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Natalie Fletcher | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.