Trustees The Abraham Initiatives
Charity number: 1119571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER BRUMMER | Chair | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mira Awad | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Evelyn Jane Collins CBE | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Khaled Ibrahim Dawas | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Alexander Saipe | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Basha'er Fahoum-Jayoussi | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Simon Hamburger | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Lyndsay Jane Simmonds | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Sampson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sackman | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ben Shimshon | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thabet Abu Rass | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMNON BEERI-SULITZEANU | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.