Trustees Northants Community Aid
Charity number: 1120895
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Sayer | Chair | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Steven Crooke | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Armstrong | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Whittaker-Smith | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Green | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leslie Bone | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
valerie Patricia Bridges | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN WALDER | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN PAUL ADAMS | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Julie Ozlati | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.