Trustees ENFIELD BOROUGH OVER 50S FORUM
Charity number: 1122859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen BALL | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA PITE | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Chinnery | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Rufai | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
TALAT SHAIKH | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Mona Mulder | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN M BALL | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN GILADI | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY WATTS MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.