Trustees THE ASHMORE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1122351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Hill | Chair | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Embry | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolina Polo | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhiren Shah | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyssa Nolan | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Shingler | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Jessica Toisuta | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Ardila Espindola | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bingham | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Coombs | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CARLETON | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.