Trustees BELVOIR CRICKET & COUNTRYSIDE TRUST
Charity number: 1131442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRINE RACHEL BYGOTT | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Vivian Hopkins | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Epton | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clowes | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Anthony James Troughton | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Dalrymple | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Turner | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
OLIVER HENRY JAMES STOCKEN CBE | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAVID PATON | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP PAUL O'BRIEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.