Trustees KING'S COLLEGE LONDON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1136729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Brinckmann | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Suresh | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janvi Rajnish Jagasia | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alizeh Abrar | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatofarati Alabi | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sadaf Abbas Cheema | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Uhayd | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Syed Muhammad Hassan Ali | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alavi Hossain | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virajit Adityaraj Singh | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thea Elise Turton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Lee | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nazreen Visram | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.