Trustees ACE - FRIENDS OF ST IVES CORN EXCHANGE
Charity number: 1132728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PAUL DOBSON | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Jade Catherine Olivia Hockie | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DICK CHALKLEY | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROB ZANCONATO | Trustee | 09 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHIL POPE | Trustee | 09 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAN DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA MARIAN LUTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.